THOMAS POCKLINGTON TRUST

Charity number: 1113729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.15m £5.66m £5.96m £5.24m £5.22m
Total expenditure £7.88m £7.97m £9.48m £7.97m £6.51m
Income from government contracts £217.98k £60.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £970 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.00k £0 £0 £37.00k £158.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.38m £590.00k £531.00k £447.00k £451.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.67m £5.07m £5.37m £4.76m £4.59m
Income - Other £100.00k £0 £54.00k £0 £18.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £152.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.35m £6.45m £6.99m £5.99m £5.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.45m £1.51m £1.50m £1.98m £1.35m
Expenditure - Governance £80.00k £73.00k £118.00k £55.00k £77.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.81m £1.82m £2.07m £2.13m £1.91m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.45m £1.51m £1.50m £55.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £84.00k £17.00k £989.00k £0 £0