THOMAS POCKLINGTON TRUST

Charity number: 1113729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 10 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24 APR 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED THROUGH SIGHT LOSS AND OTHER RELATED CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES AND INFORMATION FOR THEIR CARE AND WELFARE; AND 2) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE PREVENTION, ALLEVIATION AND CURE OF SIGHT LOSS AND OTHER RELATED CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 23 June 2006 : Standard registration