THOMAS POCKLINGTON TRUST

Charity number: 1113729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MERVYN WILLIAMSON ACA Chair None on record
Simon Curtis Trustee 22 September 2021 None on record
Matt Wadsworth Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
PHILIP JAMES LONGWORTH Trustee 07 November 2016 None on record
JENNY PEARCE BEM Trustee 04 July 2013 None on record
Helen Emma Jacqueline Mitchell Trustee 16 March 2021
THE THIRD AGE PROJECT Received: On time
Robert James Holl Trustee 16 March 2021 None on record
Rashmikant Navalchand Mehta Trustee 03 December 2019
THE MIDDLESEX ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND Received: On time
Research Institute for Disabled Consumers Received: On time
Judith Anne Potts Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
ALASTAIR BALFOUR CHAPMAN BSc FRICS Trustee None on record
GRAHAM ARTHUR FINDLAY Trustee 04 July 2017
VISIONARY - LINKING LOCAL SIGHT LOSS CHARITIES Received: On time