ADVOCACY IN BARNET LIMITED

Charity number: 1115740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £234.76k £221.47k £234.24k £148.74k £66.09k
Total expenditure £149.88k £170.04k £187.14k £206.39k £185.63k
Income from government contracts £109.00k £108.00k £109.00k N/A £42.67k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A