RIDING MILL PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1114179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £40.02k £38.47k £23.77k £69.14k £58.94k
Total expenditure £39.81k £38.05k £32.56k £55.34k £52.24k
Income from government contracts £32.20k £35.60k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £150 £41.24k