Financial history ARCHITECTURE FOR HUMANITY (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1115668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £7.68k £293 £78 £717 £133
Total expenditure £9.70k £3.41k £73 £631 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A