TEAMS4U THE CHARITY

Charity number: 1114131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

a) to promote and fulfil charitable purposes beneficial to the community. b) to relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship or who are aged or sick. c) to advance education by means of establishing and operating any educational establishment or establishments. All activities to be carried out in such parts of the UK or the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £354,124
Total expenditure: £423,150

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Romania
  • Sierra Leone
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samuel Lauder Trustee 08 November 2024
None on record
Dr Susanna Enongene Trustee 08 November 2024
None on record
Helen Mary Strange-Rhymes Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record
Deborah Katharine Parry Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Paul Duncan Jeanes Trustee 12 April 2017
None on record
JOHN NICHOLAS CAMPBELL PENGELLY Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record
JOHN EDWARDS HARRISON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £413.30k £407.56k £617.93k £339.83k £354.12k
Total expenditure £378.11k £335.88k £594.03k £447.73k £423.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.33k £54.07k £249.85k N/A £20.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £617.93k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £594.03k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.98k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 25 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 27 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Teams 4 U the Charity
Unit 8
Aerial Road
Llay Industrial Estate
Llay
WREXHAM
Phone:
01978 310110