BICKINGTON VILLAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1115259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 16/02/2016 16/02/2017 16/02/2018 16/02/2019 16/02/2020
Total gross income £14.41k £30.82k £23.69k £33.34k £13.61k
Total expenditure £6.54k £18.49k £8.28k £11.47k £28.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.69k £13.05k £5.47k £3.00k £5.00k