Financial history FRIENDS OF AMANI TANZANIA

Charity number: 1114281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £30.70k £41.65k £43.11k £107.62k £55.75k
Total expenditure £30.60k £45.57k £41.06k £102.71k £55.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A