Financial history DEAF EDUCATION THROUGH LISTENING AND TALKING

Charity number: 1115603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.27k £18.93k £32.74k £20.59k £24.37k
Total expenditure £29.32k £15.32k £9.34k £6.93k £8.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.93k £1.69k N/A N/A