Trustees DEAF EDUCATION THROUGH LISTENING AND TALKING
Charity number: 1115603

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward William Rex | Chair | 14 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Ellis-Davies | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN ARTHUR | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Joy Statham | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ROTHWELL | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYNN GAIL HOUNSOME | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.