BEDFORD & MILTON KEYNES WATERWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and campaign for the building of a navigable waterway link between the Grand Union canal in Milton Keynes and the River Great Ouse in Bedford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,496 from 4 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
115 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 19 May 2006: Standard registration
- B & MK TRUST (Working name)
- B-MK WATERWAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Jane Chipping | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Janet Elizabeth Goodland | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Chris Hilliard | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||
James Barbour | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Ashley | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Peter Clewlow | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Jane Bennett | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN MARTIN HOGARTH ARMITAGE | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Leigh Willows | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Drew Marchant | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN VINCENT MATTHEW BEST | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.57k | £177.75k | £38.34k | £63.66k | £66.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.00k | £111.40k | £2.68k | £41.75k | £64.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £101.47k | £28.53k | £2.00k | £24.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE OR PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OR VISITORS TO BEDFORDSHIRE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND MILTON KEYNES OR ANY GOVERNMENT, REGIONAL, LOCAL OR OTHER AUTHORITY WHICH VARIES OR REPLACES THESE AREAS, AND AS PART OF A PROGRAM OF REGENERATION OF THE AREA TO ENCOURAGE THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREAS TO BE BENEFITED TO TAKE PART IN AND HAVE RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE PROMOTION, PROVISION OR MAINTENANCE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND ENVIRONMENT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS OR VISITORS. 3.2 TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OR MAINTENANCE OF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OR VISITORS TO THE AREAS REFEREED TO IN CLAUSE 3.1 ABOVE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE OBJECTS EXPRESSED IN CLAUSE 3.1 ABOVE.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND MILTON KEYNES OR ANY GOVERNMENT, REGIONAL, LOCAL OR OTHER AUTHORITY WHICH VARIES OR REPLACES THESE AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 WINDMILL HILL
BIDDENHAM
BEDFORD
MK40 4AG
- Phone:
- 07879999619
- Email:
- contact@bmkwaterway.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.