DORSET SEARCH & RESCUE (DORSAR)

Charity number: 1121658
Charity reporting is 34 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not yet received
34 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not yet received
34 days overdue
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)