DORSET SEARCH & RESCUE (DORSAR)

Charity number: 1121658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Charles McGowan Trustee 28 February 2017 None on record
David Wraight Trustee 01 November 2015 None on record
TREVOR ANTELL Trustee None on record
PAUL MARTIN Trustee 15 February 2017 None on record
Paul Leslie Shelton Trustee 17 March 2021 None on record
Martin Adams Trustee 13 March 2019 None on record
Edward John Kirlew Trustee 17 March 2021 None on record
Charlotte Sarah Paull Chair 17 March 2021 None on record
Paul Turle Trustee 09 February 2018 None on record