Accounts and annual returns KAPATIRANG SANDIGAN NG PILIPINO SA UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1117102
Charity reporting is overdue by 1821 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 725 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 725 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1090 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1090 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1455 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1455 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1821 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1821 days