Trustees WEST HAM UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1114458
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDY MOLLETT Chair 04 March 2013
None on record
Jeffrey Hayes Trustee 19 December 2019
MAYOR OF BATH'S RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
Jackie Ferdinand Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
Henri Brandman Trustee 16 December 2015
None on record
JEREMY CROOK Trustee 14 March 2014
None on record
MARIE GABRIEL Trustee 04 March 2013
THE NHS CONFEDERATION
Received: On time
NEWHAM PEOPLE’S TRUST FUND
Overdue by 1429 days
EAST LONDON BUSINESS ALLIANCE
Received: On time