Islam in Action (I.I.A)

Charity number: 1115882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2020 24 March 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2019 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2018 26 April 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2017 26 April 2019 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2017 Not Required