Islam in Action (I.I.A)

Charity number: 1115882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/03/2017 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 01/03/2020 01/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £1.19k £100
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £1.17k £142
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A