IQRA EDUCATION AND WELFARE TRUST (IEWT)

Charity number: 1114471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £24.78k £138.86k £120.81k £180.56k £214.62k
Total expenditure £24.08k £107.83k £132.51k £181.63k £188.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A