HEALTHCARE FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 08 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 03 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 20 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 28 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 28 February 2017 On time Download