HEALTHCARE FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Adam Rimmer Trustee 11 December 2015 None on record
Alex Gild Trustee 06 December 2013 None on record
Owen Paul Harkin Trustee 09 December 2016 None on record
Bill Gregory Trustee 11 December 2015 None on record
Caroline Clarke Chair 09 December 2016
THE ROYAL FREE CHARITY Received: On time
OVERCOMING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS Received: On time
Lee Outhwaite Trustee 09 December 2016 None on record
Sandra Easton Trustee 07 December 2018 None on record
Elizabeth O'Mahony Trustee 13 July 2017 None on record
Lee William Bond Trustee 07 December 2018 None on record
Dr Kavita Keren Gnanaolivu Trustee 06 December 2019 None on record
Claire Louise Wilson Trustee 07 December 2018 None on record
Carol Potter Trustee 07 December 2017 None on record
Simon Paul Crowther Trustee 06 December 2019 None on record
Sanjay Agrawal Trustee 09 December 2016
ACTION ON SMOKING AND HEALTH (ASH) Received: On time