NOON ACADEMY

Charity number: 1115583
Charity reporting is up to date (187 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 May 2021 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 May 2021 187 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 November 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 November 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 August 2019 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 August 2019 287 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 January 2018 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 January 2018 82 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 December 2016 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 05 December 2016 35 days late Download