NOON ACADEMY

Charity number: 1115583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.68k £29.98k £36.18k £90.05k £94.53k
Total expenditure £70.31k £68.21k £72.72k £78.77k £116.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £22.93k