POSSABILITY PEOPLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1114435
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)