BOURNEMOUTH BLIND SOCIETY

Charity number: 1114570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 September 2017 On time Download