Trustees BYHP (TACKLING THE ROOT CAUSES OF YOUTH HOMELESSNESS)
Charity Number: 1115514

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Stevens | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Sarginson | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Austen | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin Cadbury | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK PETTERSON | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|||||
ALINE SHAND | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN HOCKLEY SMITH | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.