Trustees BOURNE FREE

Charity number: 1115708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dawn Lewis Chair 11 September 2022
None on record
Jack Timothy Cannon Trustee 07 December 2022
None on record
Sonja Critchley Trustee 11 September 2022
None on record
Rhiannon Toresen Trustee 04 January 2022
None on record
Lee Tolley Trustee 04 January 2022
None on record
Mark Stanley Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record
Christopher Ashton Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record
NEAL ERRINGTON Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record
LOUISE CLARKE Trustee 17 May 2012
AFC BOURNEMOUTH COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST
Received: On time