MISSION OF FAITH CHRIST GOSPEL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Advancement of the Christian Religion and Faith in accordance with the statement of Beliefs, including the worship of God and furtherance of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ in the Borough of Hackney Engaged in community development and improvement throughout the area of benefit,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hackney
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 17 October 2006: Standard registration
- MFCGM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOREEN MAKINYAMBA | Trustee | 07 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
TEMITOPE AKOMOLAFE | Trustee | 07 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALAMAT AKOMOLAFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.21k | £34.30k | £50.26k | £55.87k | £51.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.20k | £55.09k | £58.00k | £60.20k | £50.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2023 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
18 July 2023 | 383 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
25 August 2020 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT;
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Destiny House (Buxton Club)
112F High Street
Walthamstow
London
E17 7JY
- Phone:
- 02036020624
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window