Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST HOREB OF GOD PARISH

Charity number: 1115753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window