Accounts and annual returns TEEBAH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1116883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 June 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 June 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 June 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 June 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 17 October 2018 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 October 2018 139 days late Download Open in new window