Financial history TEEBAH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1116883
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £21.78k £115.50k £223.66k £230.16k £335.23k
Total expenditure £20.19k £39.28k £183.50k £191.42k £236.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A