Accounts and annual returns THE PIOTR MACIEJ & HENRYKA MARIA KOZLOWSKI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window