ASR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASR pursues medical and educational activities around Amritsar, Punjab, India. These include first aid and multispeciality medical camps focussing on visual and other medical problems; a free dispensary in Goindwal Sahib, around 45km from Amritsar; a first aid post outside the Golden Temple, Amritsar; and educational projects helping needy students achieve their educational potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 06 July 2006: Standard registration
- ACT (Working name)
- ASR (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr INDER PAL SINGH | Chair | 21 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
HARMINDER SINGH | Trustee | 21 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
Dr BHAGTESHWAR SINGH | Trustee | 21 April 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.14k | £31.81k | £64.49k | £65.08k | £94.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.60k | £22.60k | £51.52k | £62.18k | £71.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH IN THE AMRITSAR DISTRICT OF THE STATE OF PUNJAB IN INDIA, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL/FIRST AID CARE FREE OF CHARGE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ORPHANS AT THE CENTRAL KHALSA ORPHANAGE IN AMRITSAR IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS. 3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Fennel Grove
Streetly
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B74 3QY
- Phone:
- 07739464262
- Email:
- info@asrcharitabletrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window