Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST AYOMIDE PARISH
Charity number: 1115765
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 October 2023 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 October 2023 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 04 September 2019 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window