THE PENFOLD TRUST

Charity number: 1114854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.93k £2.03k £2.14k £1.79k £1.90k
Total expenditure £2.31k £2.42k £2.42k £1.99k £113
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A