Accounts and annual returns MUSLIM SHIA WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1114885
Charity reporting is overdue by 237 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 March 2022 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 March 2022 873 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required