KILMINGTON & STOURTON WI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer friendship and companionship. To improve and develop the quality of life, particularly in rural areas for women and their families. Advance the education of women in citizenship and public issues, national and international.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 July 2006: Standard registration
- MAIDEN BRADLEY AND KILMINGTON WI (Previous name)
- MAIDEN BRADLEY WI (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VANESSA MARGARET MEEKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachel Harrison | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE PARKER | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JILL KATHLEEN TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04k | £1.41k | £800 | £889 | £939 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £496 | £509 | £1.08k | £684 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/11/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2012
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WILTSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park House
Kilmington Common
Kilmington
WARMINSTER
BA12 6QY
- Phone:
- 01985 844597
- Email:
- chuchelmccabe@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window