JUSTICE FIRST LIMITED

Charity number: 1116388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 06 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 08 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 08 November 2016 On time Download