JUSTICE FIRST LIMITED

Charity number: 1116388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £114.40k £92.50k £114.78k £148.13k £166.70k
Total expenditure £114.69k £106.63k £121.01k £135.17k £151.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £900 £500 £5.00k £15.00k £21.50k