Trustees JUSTICE FIRST LIMITED
Charity number: 1116388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA HELEN HUNGIN | Chair |
|
||||||
Hamida White | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ollis | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samsoudini Mohamed Abdou Moussa | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Wilson | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK JOHN HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE RAMOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Tresor Nyembwe BUKASA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.