Trustees MIDLAND DOCTORS ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1114559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr SYED YUSUF IFTIKHAR Chair
None on record
Dr Farhan Rashid Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
MOHAMMED ALTAF Trustee 15 May 2018
PAK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Toni Kent-Chapman Trustee 15 May 2015
None on record
Rahim Ullah Amin Trustee 28 March 2014
None on record
Dr IFTIKHAR ALI Trustee 03 October 2012
None on record
Dr JAVED AHMED Trustee
None on record
Dr ASRAR RASHID Trustee
None on record
Dr KHALID LATIEF Trustee
None on record
AJAZ NAJIB Trustee
None on record
SHAFQAT HUSSAIN Trustee
None on record
Dr ZAHID SHEIKH Trustee
None on record