Financial history THE PEIRES FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £275.02k £300.01k £264.01k £284.39k £25.12k
Total expenditure £321.80k £339.69k £203.58k £205.71k £163.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A