Accounts and annual returns HOLY GHOST ZONE LONDON

Charity number: 1115001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window