BOLTON COMMUNITY LEISURE

Charity number: 1117186
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.97m £5.87m £5.68m £5.78m £5.21m
Total expenditure £5.86m £5.82m £5.64m £5.80m £5.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.29m £2.22m £2.12m £1.82m £1.24m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £5.97m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £5.87m £5.68m £5.78m £781
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £232 £300 £62 £276 £5.21m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.78m £5.82m £5.64m £5.80m £5.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £72.70k £66.71k £63.21k £71.09k £86.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0