THE ANALYTICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1116113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 09 March 2020 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 05 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required