THE ANALYTICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1116113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £2.32k £2.32k £1 £3 £5
Total expenditure £390 £780 £1.14k £390 £390
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A