MAKE A DIFFERENCE, TAVISTOCK

Charity number: 1115769
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £13.22k £18.32k £21.43k £24.98k £77.79k
Total expenditure £16.64k £15.59k £16.96k £19.22k £57.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £8.00k £8.00k £8.00k £69.87k