Financial history SATMAR LIMITED

Charity number: 1115025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £63.21k £87.06k £202.94k £768.86k £157.72k
Total expenditure £67.44k £100.46k £144.94k £247.66k £161.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £722.35k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £46.50k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £154.00k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £50.68k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £13.99k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £113.37k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £50.68k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £42.98k N/A