Accounts and annual returns BRIXTON KIWANIS COMMUNITY CHEST TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1114993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2020 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 June 2018 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required