Financial history BRIXTON KIWANIS COMMUNITY CHEST TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1114993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.39k £3.97k £971 £3.84k £3.59k
Total expenditure £7.58k £3.65k £2.91k £4.09k £3.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A